Personligheter i Wehrmacht - Waffen-SS
|
|
|
Karl_Donitx.JPGKarl Dönitz58 views (0 votes)
|
|
Karl_Koller_281898_-_195129.JPGKarl Koller (1898 - 1951)84 viewsKarl Koller (22 February 1898 – 22 December 1951) was a German General der Flieger and the Chief of the General Staff of Luftwaffe during World War II.
Flugzeugführer-Abzeichen
Iron Cross (1914)
2nd Class
1st Class
Cross of Honor
Wehrmacht Long Service Award 4th to 1st Class
Sudetenland Medal with Prague Castle Bar
Iron Cross (1939)
2nd Class
1st Class
Wound Badge of 20 July 1944
in Black
Combined Pilots-Observation Badge
German Cross in Gold (7 February 1944)
Knight's Cross of the Iron Cross on 10 April 1942 as Oberst im Generalstab (in the General Staff) and Chief of the Generalstaff of Luftflotte 2 (0 votes)
|
|
Karl_Torley_1913_-_1943.JPGKarl Torley 1913 - 19434 views (0 votes)
|
|
Kurt_Prinz_1920_-_2009.JPGKurt Prinz 1920 - 200911 views (0 votes)
|
|
OBERST_DR__AUGUST_FRIKER_1899-1966.jpg22 views (0 votes)
|
|
Otto_Ernst_Remer.JPGOtto Ernst Remer 18.08.1912 - 04.10.199713 viewsOtto Ernst Remer (18 August 1912 – 4 October 1997) was a German Wehrmacht officer in World War II who played a major role in stopping the 20 July plot in 1944 against Adolf Hitler. (0 votes)
|
|
Otto_Schniewind.JPGOtto Schniewind 1887 - 196458 views (0 votes)
|
|
Otto_Weidinger_1914_-_1990.JPGOtto Weidinger 1914 - 199014 views (0 votes)
|
|
Otto_Weiss_281907_-_195529.JPGOtto Weiss (1907 - 1955)132 viewsIron Cross (1939)
2nd Class (13 September 1939)
1st Class (30 September 1939)
Knight's Cross of the Iron Cross with Oak Leaves
Knight's Cross on 18 May 1940 as Hauptmann and Gruppenkommandeur of the II.(S)/LG 2
Oak Leaves on 31 December 1941 as Major and Gruppenkommandeur of the II.(S)/LG 2 (0 votes)
|
|
Paul_Hausser_1880-1972.JPGPaul Hausser 1880 - 197268 views (0 votes)
|
|
Paul_Laux_1887_-_1944.JPGPaul Laux 1887 - 19447 views (0 votes)
|
|
Paul_Ludwig_Ewald_von_Kleist_1881_-_1954.JPGPaul Ludwig Ewald von Kleist 1881 - 19546 views (0 votes)
|
|
Reinhard_Hardegen_1913_-_2018.JPGReinhard Hardegen 1913 - 20188 views (0 votes)
|
|
Robert_Ley_1890_-_1945.JPGRobert ley 1890 - 19456 views (0 votes)
|
|
Robert_Ritter_von_Greim_1882-1945.jpgRobert Rittert von Greim97 viewsIron Cross of 1914 2nd Class (26 November 1914) & 1st Class (10 October 1915)
Military Merit Cross (Bavaria)
The Honour Cross of the World War 1914/1918
Knight's Cross of the Military Order of Max Joseph (23 October 1918)
Pour le Mérite (14 October 1918)
Knight's Cross of the Iron Cross with Oak Leaves and Swords
Knight's Cross on 24 June 1940 as Generalleutnant and commander of V. Flieger-Korps
Oak Leaves on 2 April 1943 as Generaloberst and commander of Luftflottenkommando Ost (Luftflotte 6)
Swords on 27 August 1944 as Generaloberst and commander of Luftflotte 6 (0 votes)
|
|
Rudolf_Freiherr_von_Waldenfels_1895_-_1969.JPGRudolf Freiherr von Waldenfels 1895 -19697 views (0 votes)
|
|
|